THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:36:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Pediatric Critical
Care Medicine
555 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 02 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 02 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M Gaetani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Feb 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gaetani (CPSO#: 114740 )
Business Address: 1388 Forestbrook Rd
Oakville ON L6M 2H6
6476423318
Business Address: 555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Pediatric Critical
Care Medicine
555 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 02 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 02 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M Gaetani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Feb 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gaetani (CPSO#: 114740 )
Business Address: 1388 Forestbrook Rd
Oakville ON L6M 2H6
6476423318
Business Address: 555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELANY ANN GAETANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAETANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELANY ANN GAETANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAETANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 May 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018