THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:53:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Birmingham, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 135 Queens Plate Drive
Unit 101
Toronto Ontario M9W 6V1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 638-2000
Extension: ext 2
Fax: (905) 793-9323
Address: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton Civic Hospital
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Phone: 9054942120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 20 Lynch St
Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
Brampton ON L6W 2Z8
Phone: 9054942120
Fax: 905-863-2477
Address: 115 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Wellness Centre
Etobicoke Renal Centre
3rd floor
Toronto Ontario M9V 1R8
Phone: 416-747-3400
Extension: 32484
Fax: 416-747-3052

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 22 Sep 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 22 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SUNCHIT MADAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Madan (CPSO#: 114768 )
Business Address: 32 Firglen Ridge
Woodbridge ON L4L 1N4
(905)638-2000 Extn: 2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: University of Birmingham, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 135 Queens Plate Drive
Unit 101
Toronto Ontario M9W 6V1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 638-2000
Extension: ext 2
Fax: (905) 793-9323
Address: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton Civic Hospital
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Phone: 9054942120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 20 Lynch St
Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
Brampton ON L6W 2Z8
Phone: 9054942120
Fax: 905-863-2477
Address: 115 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Wellness Centre
Etobicoke Renal Centre
3rd floor
Toronto Ontario M9V 1R8
Phone: 416-747-3400
Extension: 32484
Fax: 416-747-3052

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 22 Sep 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 22 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SUNCHIT MADAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Madan (CPSO#: 114768 )
Business Address: 32 Firglen Ridge
Woodbridge ON L4L 1N4
(905)638-2000 Extn: 2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUNCHIT MADAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MADAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUNCHIT MADAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MADAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Birmingham, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018