THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:46:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 759-3434
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brenna Duffy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Duffy (CPSO#: 114796 )
Business Address: 1 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1B7
807-737-3030

Corporation Name: Dr. Brenna Duffy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Mar 2025

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 759-3434
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brenna Duffy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Duffy (CPSO#: 114796 )
Business Address: 1 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1B7
807-737-3030

Corporation Name: Dr. Brenna Duffy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Mar 2025

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRENNA MARIE DUFFY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUFFY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRENNA MARIE DUFFY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUFFY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 2018
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 May 2018