THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:53:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 25 King Street West
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Division of Oncology
Queen's University
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6135496666
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 13 Sep 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 13 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. GORDON TAYLOR MOFFAT MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Moffat (CPSO#: 114811 )
Business Address: 6-176 York Street
Kingston Ontario K7K 1R4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 25 King Street West
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Division of Oncology
Queen's University
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6135496666
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 13 Sep 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 13 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. GORDON TAYLOR MOFFAT MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Moffat (CPSO#: 114811 )
Business Address: 6-176 York Street
Kingston Ontario K7K 1R4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GORDON TAYLOR MOFFAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOFFAT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GORDON TAYLOR MOFFAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOFFAT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Apr 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 May 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 May 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Apr 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Mar 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 May 2018