THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:33:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Bombay, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: unit 207-1525 Albion Road
Toronto Ontario M9V 5G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6473318343
Fax: 4162345695

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Dec 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 12 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Pradip Eknath Gujare Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jan 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Gujare (CPSO#: 114814 )
Business Address: 1525 Albion Rd
Unit 202
Etobicoke ON M9V 5G5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: University of Bombay, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: unit 207-1525 Albion Road
Toronto Ontario M9V 5G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6473318343
Fax: 4162345695

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Dec 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 12 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Pradip Eknath Gujare Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jan 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Gujare (CPSO#: 114814 )
Business Address: 1525 Albion Rd
Unit 202
Etobicoke ON M9V 5G5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PRADIP EKNATH GUJARE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUJARE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PRADIP EKNATH GUJARE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUJARE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Bombay, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 2018
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 May 2018