THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:46:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 80-3465 Platinum Dr
Aafiyat Medical Centre
Mississauga ON L5M 2S1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 813-0786
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 04 Sep 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sana Merchant Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Mar 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Merchant (CPSO#: 114820 )
Business Address: 80-3465 Platinum Dr
Aafiyat Medical Centre
Mississauga ON L5M 2S1
(289) 813-0786

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 80-3465 Platinum Dr
Aafiyat Medical Centre
Mississauga ON L5M 2S1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 813-0786
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 04 Sep 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sana Merchant Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Mar 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Merchant (CPSO#: 114820 )
Business Address: 80-3465 Platinum Dr
Aafiyat Medical Centre
Mississauga ON L5M 2S1
(289) 813-0786

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
12 Dec 2019
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 12 2019
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Sana Merchant may practise medicine independently in pediatrics.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Sana Merchant may practise medicine independently in pediatrics.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 Dec 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 May 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 May 2018