THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 02:13:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Temmy Latner Centre
60 Murray Street
4th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Extension: 7884
Fax: (416) 586-4804

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: OLWI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Feb 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Olwi (CPSO#: 114835 )
Business Address:

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Temmy Latner Centre
60 Murray Street
4th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Extension: 7884
Fax: (416) 586-4804

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: OLWI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Feb 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Olwi (CPSO#: 114835 )
Business Address:

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAWAA IBRAHIM A OLWI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLWI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAWAA IBRAHIM A OLWI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLWI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 May 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 May 2018