THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 03:54:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200 Fourth Ave
St. Catharines ON L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 11 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JAMES ZHENG MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Zheng (CPSO#: 114857 )
Business Address: 1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON L2S 0A9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200 Fourth Ave
St. Catharines ON L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 11 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JAMES ZHENG MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Zheng (CPSO#: 114857 )
Business Address: 1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON L2S 0A9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES YUAN ZHENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHENG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES YUAN ZHENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHENG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018