THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:09:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of South Africa(Medun, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TIGRIGNA

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 595 Bradley Avenue
204-595 Bradley Avenue
London Ontario N6E 3Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5192035841
Fax: 5192035844
Address: 528 Dundas St
London ON N6B 1W6
Phone: 5196451533
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Selamawit Teclegiorgis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 May 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Teclegiorgis (CPSO#: 114893 )
Business Address: Lambeth Station Medical Centre
2519 Main Street
London Ontario N6P 1P9
Business Address: 595 Bradley Avenue
London Ontario N6E 3Z8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TIGRIGNA
Medical School: Medical University of South Africa(Medun, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 595 Bradley Avenue
204-595 Bradley Avenue
London Ontario N6E 3Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5192035841
Fax: 5192035844
Address: 528 Dundas St
London ON N6B 1W6
Phone: 5196451533
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Selamawit Teclegiorgis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 May 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Teclegiorgis (CPSO#: 114893 )
Business Address: Lambeth Station Medical Centre
2519 Main Street
London Ontario N6P 1P9
Business Address: 595 Bradley Avenue
London Ontario N6E 3Z8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SELAMAWIT WELDEMICHAEL TECLEGIORGIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TECLEGIORGIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SELAMAWIT WELDEMICHAEL TECLEGIORGIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TECLEGIORGIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of South Africa(Medun, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 2018
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 May 2018