THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:15:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5 Beck Blvd
Penetanguishene ON L9M 1C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7059153322
Fax: 7059151198

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Byron Song Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Song (CPSO#: 114894 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5 Beck Blvd
Penetanguishene ON L9M 1C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7059153322
Fax: 7059151198

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Byron Song Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Song (CPSO#: 114894 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BYRON SONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BYRON SONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jan 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Jan 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018