THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:27:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 204-6420 Beatty Line North
Fergus ON N1M 2W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-843-4380
Fax: 519-843-3211
Address: 115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J8
Phone: 4167882696
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 28 Oct 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Homewood Health Centre Guelph
Groves Memorial Community Hospital Fergus
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Homewood Health Centre
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
LOCATION: Fergus

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joel R. Phillips Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jan 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Phillips (CPSO#: 114899 )
Business Address: 6420 Beatty Line North
Unit 204
Fergus Ontario N1M 2W3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 204-6420 Beatty Line North
Fergus ON N1M 2W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-843-4380
Fax: 519-843-3211
Address: 115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J8
Phone: 4167882696
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 28 Oct 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Homewood Health Centre Guelph
Groves Memorial Community Hospital Fergus
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Homewood Health Centre
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
LOCATION: Fergus

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joel R. Phillips Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jan 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Phillips (CPSO#: 114899 )
Business Address: 6420 Beatty Line North
Unit 204
Fergus Ontario N1M 2W3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOEL RYAN PHILLIPS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHILLIPS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOEL RYAN PHILLIPS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHILLIPS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018