THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:11:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-845-2571
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Jan 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 28 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patrick L. Macos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Macos (CPSO#: 114935 )
Business Address: 89 Argyle Street
Toronto Ontario M6J 1N8
Business Address: 107 Concord Ave
Suite 3A
514-726-5564

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-845-2571
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Jan 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 28 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patrick L. Macos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Macos (CPSO#: 114935 )
Business Address: 89 Argyle Street
Toronto Ontario M6J 1N8
Business Address: 107 Concord Ave
Suite 3A
514-726-5564

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICK LAWRENCE MACOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACOS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICK LAWRENCE MACOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACOS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Aug 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018