THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 04:21:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: L H S C - Victoria Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
800 Commissioners Rd E
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: PO Box 5777 Stn B
Pain Management Clinic
Pain Medicine
Room B3-030
London ON N6A 4V2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 339 Windermere Road
LHSC University Site
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Phone: 0
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
St Joseph's Hospital
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Phone: 0
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 189 Elm Street
St Thomas Elgin General
St. Thomas Ontario N5R 5C4
Phone: 0
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford General Hospital
Stratford Ontario N5A 2Y6
Phone: 0
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 395 Carrie Street
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
Strathroy Ontario N7G 2A5
Phone: 0
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pain Medicine
Effective: 21 Oct 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pain Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 21 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Cheng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Cheng (CPSO#: 114943 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
LHSC Victoria Site
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: 339 Windermere Road
LHSC University Site
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
St Joseph's Hospital
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Address: 46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford General Hospital
Stratford Ontario N5A 2Y6
Business Address: 395 Carrie Street
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
Strathroy Ontario N7G 2A5
Business Address: 189 Elm Street
St Thomas Elgin General
St. Thomas Ontario N5R 5C4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: L H S C - Victoria Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
800 Commissioners Rd E
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: PO Box 5777 Stn B
Pain Management Clinic
Pain Medicine
Room B3-030
London ON N6A 4V2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 339 Windermere Road
LHSC University Site
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Phone: 0
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
St Joseph's Hospital
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Phone: 0
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 189 Elm Street
St Thomas Elgin General
St. Thomas Ontario N5R 5C4
Phone: 0
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford General Hospital
Stratford Ontario N5A 2Y6
Phone: 0
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 395 Carrie Street
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
Strathroy Ontario N7G 2A5
Phone: 0
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pain Medicine
Effective: 21 Oct 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pain Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 21 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Cheng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Cheng (CPSO#: 114943 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
LHSC Victoria Site
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: 339 Windermere Road
LHSC University Site
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
St Joseph's Hospital
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Address: 46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford General Hospital
Stratford Ontario N5A 2Y6
Business Address: 395 Carrie Street
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
Strathroy Ontario N7G 2A5
Business Address: 189 Elm Street
St Thomas Elgin General
St. Thomas Ontario N5R 5C4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SONNY CHENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHENG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SONNY CHENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHENG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018