THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:14:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 610 University Ave
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Medical Oncology & Hematology
5-700
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4169464501
Extension: 2375
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. GOHAL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gohal (CPSO#: 114945 )
Business Address: 3219 Yonge Street
PO Box 384
Toronto Ontario M4N 2L3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 610 University Ave
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Medical Oncology & Hematology
5-700
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4169464501
Extension: 2375
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. GOHAL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gohal (CPSO#: 114945 )
Business Address: 3219 Yonge Street
PO Box 384
Toronto Ontario M4N 2L3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIMRRAN GOHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOHAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIMRRAN GOHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOHAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018