THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:15:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Robert Speck Parkway
Chartwell Robert Speck Retirement Residence
Mississauga Ontario L4Z 0A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-501-9922
Fax: 905-803-6056
Address: 1025 Queen St W
CAMH Nicotine Dependence Clinic
5th floor
Toronto ON M6J 1H4
Phone: 416 535 8501
Fax: 416 599 8265

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. MONICA GAD MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Mar 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gad (CPSO#: 114970 )
Business Address: 2145 Dunwin Dr
Mississauga ON L5L 4L9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Robert Speck Parkway
Chartwell Robert Speck Retirement Residence
Mississauga Ontario L4Z 0A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-501-9922
Fax: 905-803-6056
Address: 1025 Queen St W
CAMH Nicotine Dependence Clinic
5th floor
Toronto ON M6J 1H4
Phone: 416 535 8501
Fax: 416 599 8265

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. MONICA GAD MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Mar 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gad (CPSO#: 114970 )
Business Address: 2145 Dunwin Dr
Mississauga ON L5L 4L9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MONICA GAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MONICA GAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 May 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 May 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018