THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 05:11:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7000 Westminster Highway
Richmond British Columbia V6X 1A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (604) 278-9711
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 189 Elm St
St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital
St Thomas ON N5R 5C4
Phone: 519-631-2020
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Anson General Hospital Iroquois Falls
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
North Shore Health Network Blind River
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls
St. Joseph's General Hospital - Elliot Lake Elliot Lake
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Brightshores Health System Owen Sound
Blanche River Health Englehart
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
HOSPITAL: Anson General Hospital
LOCATION: Iroquois Falls

HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

HOSPITAL: North Shore Health Network
LOCATION: Blind River

HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

HOSPITAL: West Nipissing General Hospital
LOCATION: Sturgeon Falls

HOSPITAL: St. Joseph's General Hospital - Elliot Lake
LOCATION: Elliot Lake

HOSPITAL: Hanover and District Hospital
LOCATION: Hanover

HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

HOSPITAL: Brightshores Health System
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: Blanche River Health
LOCATION: Englehart

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: YIM TAI LAWRENCE YAU MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Yau (CPSO#: 114994 )
Business Address: 189 Elm Street
St. Thomas Ontario N5R 1J3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7000 Westminster Highway
Richmond British Columbia V6X 1A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (604) 278-9711
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 189 Elm St
St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital
St Thomas ON N5R 5C4
Phone: 519-631-2020
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Anson General Hospital Iroquois Falls
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
North Shore Health Network Blind River
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls
St. Joseph's General Hospital - Elliot Lake Elliot Lake
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Brightshores Health System Owen Sound
Blanche River Health Englehart
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
HOSPITAL: Anson General Hospital
LOCATION: Iroquois Falls

HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

HOSPITAL: North Shore Health Network
LOCATION: Blind River

HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

HOSPITAL: West Nipissing General Hospital
LOCATION: Sturgeon Falls

HOSPITAL: St. Joseph's General Hospital - Elliot Lake
LOCATION: Elliot Lake

HOSPITAL: Hanover and District Hospital
LOCATION: Hanover

HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

HOSPITAL: Brightshores Health System
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: Blanche River Health
LOCATION: Englehart

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: YIM TAI LAWRENCE YAU MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Yau (CPSO#: 114994 )
Business Address: 189 Elm Street
St. Thomas Ontario N5R 1J3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YIM TAI LAWRENCE YAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YIM TAI LAWRENCE YAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jan 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018