THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 05:19:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KOREAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-3319 Bayview Ave
Rejoo Clinic
Store 29B
North York ON M2K 1G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-257-3319
Fax: 47-689-2375

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. JIYEH JOO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Joo (CPSO#: 115006 )
Business Address: 649 Sheppard Ave W
North York ON M3H 2S4
Business Address: 3319 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M2K 1G4
416-257-3319

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KOREAN
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-3319 Bayview Ave
Rejoo Clinic
Store 29B
North York ON M2K 1G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-257-3319
Fax: 47-689-2375

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. JIYEH JOO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Joo (CPSO#: 115006 )
Business Address: 649 Sheppard Ave W
North York ON M3H 2S4
Business Address: 3319 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M2K 1G4
416-257-3319

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JIYEH JOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JIYEH JOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018