THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 04:08:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: Bleeker, Helena Elizabeth (Used Until: 28 Nov 2022)
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2022
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GREEK

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Department of Anesthesia
Rm B302
1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 14 Dec 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 14 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Helena Purcell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Purcell (CPSO#: 115024 )
Business Address: 1-190 Cartier St
Ottawa ON K2P 1L2

General Information

Former Name: Bleeker, Helena Elizabeth (Used Until: 28 Nov 2022)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GREEK
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2022

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Department of Anesthesia
Rm B302
1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 14 Dec 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 14 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Helena Purcell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Purcell (CPSO#: 115024 )
Business Address: 1-190 Cartier St
Ottawa ON K2P 1L2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HELENA ELIZABETH PURCELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PURCELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HELENA ELIZABETH PURCELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PURCELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2022

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Dec 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018