THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:18:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 909 Boulevard de La Vérendrye Ouest
Hôpital de Gatineau
Gatineau Québec J8P 7H2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 116 Boul Lionel-Émond
Hull Hospital
Gatineau QC J8Y 1W7
Phone: 819-966-6200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andre Richard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Richard (CPSO#: 115033 )
Business Address: 116 Boul Lionel-Émond
Gatineau QC J8Y 1W7
Business Address: 713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 909 Boulevard de La Vérendrye Ouest
Hôpital de Gatineau
Gatineau Québec J8P 7H2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 116 Boul Lionel-Émond
Hull Hospital
Gatineau QC J8Y 1W7
Phone: 819-966-6200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andre Richard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Richard (CPSO#: 115033 )
Business Address: 116 Boul Lionel-Émond
Gatineau QC J8Y 1W7
Business Address: 713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDRE EMMANUEL RICHARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHARD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDRE EMMANUEL RICHARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHARD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Jul 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018