THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:21:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Manipal Academy of Higher Education, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, KANNADA, TELUGU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 879 Shefford Road
Ottawa Ontario K1J 8H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137412020
Fax: 6137415997

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: HIMABINDU VELURI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Veluri (CPSO#: 115037 )
Business Address: 613-741-2020

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, KANNADA, TELUGU
Medical School: Manipal Academy of Higher Education, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 879 Shefford Road
Ottawa Ontario K1J 8H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137412020
Fax: 6137415997

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: HIMABINDU VELURI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Veluri (CPSO#: 115037 )
Business Address: 613-741-2020

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HIMABINDU VELURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VELURI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HIMABINDU VELURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VELURI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Manipal Academy of Higher Education, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jan 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018