THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:30:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1053 Carling Ave
The Ottawa Hospital, Civic Campus
Mental Health (Hospitalist)
B6/D6 Psychiatry (Hospitalist)
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137227000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tarun Rahman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rahman (CPSO#: 115059 )
Business Address: 31 Nova Scotia Walk
First Floor
Elliot Lake ON P5A 1Y9
705-461-8882
Business Address: 1053 Carling Ave
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Transitional Care Unit (TCU)
E5
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1053 Carling Ave
The Ottawa Hospital, Civic Campus
Mental Health (Hospitalist)
B6/D6 Psychiatry (Hospitalist)
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137227000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tarun Rahman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rahman (CPSO#: 115059 )
Business Address: 31 Nova Scotia Walk
First Floor
Elliot Lake ON P5A 1Y9
705-461-8882
Business Address: 1053 Carling Ave
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Transitional Care Unit (TCU)
E5
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIKDAR TARUN RAHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAHMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIKDAR TARUN RAHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAHMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Apr 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018