THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:43:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 14 Isabella Street
Perth Ontario K7H 2W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-267-1200
Fax: 613-267-5706
Address: 115 Christie Lake Rd
Perth ON K7H 3C6
Phone: 613-267-4225
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chandra Eberhard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Eberhard (CPSO#: 115063 )
Business Address: 14 Isabella St
Perth ON K7H 2W6
Business Address: 33 Drummond St W
Perth ON K7H 2K1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 14 Isabella Street
Perth Ontario K7H 2W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-267-1200
Fax: 613-267-5706
Address: 115 Christie Lake Rd
Perth ON K7H 3C6
Phone: 613-267-4225
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chandra Eberhard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Eberhard (CPSO#: 115063 )
Business Address: 14 Isabella St
Perth ON K7H 2W6
Business Address: 33 Drummond St W
Perth ON K7H 2K1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHANDRA EMILIE EBERHARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EBERHARD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHANDRA EMILIE EBERHARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EBERHARD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 27 Jul 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018