THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
28/05/25 03:08:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2018
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Postgraduate Medical Education
Schulich School of Medicine
University of Western Ontario
Room M106 Medical Science Building
London Ontario N6A 5C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196612019
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MATTHEW ORMSBY RENAUD MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Oct 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Renaud (CPSO#: 115071 )
Business Address: 80 Grand Ave W
Chatham ON N7L 1B7
5193526400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Postgraduate Medical Education
Schulich School of Medicine
University of Western Ontario
Room M106 Medical Science Building
London Ontario N6A 5C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196612019
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MATTHEW ORMSBY RENAUD MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Oct 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Renaud (CPSO#: 115071 )
Business Address: 80 Grand Ave W
Chatham ON N7L 1B7
5193526400

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW ORMSBY RENAUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RENAUD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW ORMSBY RENAUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RENAUD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jan 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018