THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:36:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 445 Inglehart St N
Oakville ON L6J 3J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 844-8800
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. KATHRYN AUSTIN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Austin (CPSO#: 115109 )
Business Address: 445 Inglehart St N
Oakville ON L6J 3J5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 445 Inglehart St N
Oakville ON L6J 3J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 844-8800
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. KATHRYN AUSTIN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Austin (CPSO#: 115109 )
Business Address: 445 Inglehart St N
Oakville ON L6J 3J5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHRYN BROOKE AUSTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUSTIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHRYN BROOKE AUSTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUSTIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018