THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:38:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Zanjan University of Medical Sciences, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6668 3rd Line
Vennix Integrated Health
Building A
Tottenham ON L0G 1W0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9059364211
Fax: 9059363493

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jan 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 05 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. ZAHRA S VAHABI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL COOPERATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Syavash Vahabi (CPSO#: 115124 )
Business Address: 6668 3rd Line
New Tecumseth Ontario L0G 1W0
Business Address: 180 Parsons Road
New Tecumseth Ontario L9R 1E8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Zanjan University of Medical Sciences, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6668 3rd Line
Vennix Integrated Health
Building A
Tottenham ON L0G 1W0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9059364211
Fax: 9059363493

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jan 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 05 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. ZAHRA S VAHABI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL COOPERATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Syavash Vahabi (CPSO#: 115124 )
Business Address: 6668 3rd Line
New Tecumseth Ontario L0G 1W0
Business Address: 180 Parsons Road
New Tecumseth Ontario L9R 1E8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZAHRA SYAVASH VAHABI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SYAVASH VAHABI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZAHRA SYAVASH VAHABI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SYAVASH VAHABI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Zanjan University of Medical Sciences, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Jan 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Jul 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Apr 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018