THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:52:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-21 Front St S
Thorold ON L2V 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 688-6460
Fax: (905) 687-1855
Address: 1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines General Hospital
Emergency Medicine
St. Catharines ON L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ryan Chadwick Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chadwick (CPSO#: 115139 )
Business Address: 21 Front St S
Suite 201
Thorold ON L2V 1W8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-21 Front St S
Thorold ON L2V 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 688-6460
Fax: (905) 687-1855
Address: 1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines General Hospital
Emergency Medicine
St. Catharines ON L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ryan Chadwick Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chadwick (CPSO#: 115139 )
Business Address: 21 Front St S
Suite 201
Thorold ON L2V 1W8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RYAN CHRISTOPHER CHADWICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHADWICK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RYAN CHRISTOPHER CHADWICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHADWICK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Apr 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jan 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Jan 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018