THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:48:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 825 Coxwell Ave
Michael Garron Hospital
Emergency Department
East York ON M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 40 Prince Arthur Ave
Toronto ON M5R 1A9
Phone: (416) 960 2020
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Nov 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marlee Klaiman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Klaiman (CPSO#: 115146 )
Business Address: 825 Coxwell Ave
East York ON M4C 3E7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 825 Coxwell Ave
Michael Garron Hospital
Emergency Department
East York ON M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 40 Prince Arthur Ave
Toronto ON M5R 1A9
Phone: (416) 960 2020
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Nov 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marlee Klaiman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Klaiman (CPSO#: 115146 )
Business Address: 825 Coxwell Ave
East York ON M4C 3E7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARLEE KLAIMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLAIMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARLEE KLAIMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLAIMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018