THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:41:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KOREAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Tay River Health Centre
9 Eric Devlin Lane
Suite 105
Perth ON K7H 0C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-201-9300
Fax: 613-201-9301

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. WOOHYUN OH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Oh (CPSO#: 115154 )
Business Address: 105-9 Eric Devlin Lane
Perth ON K7H 0C4
613-201-9300

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KOREAN
Medical School: McMaster University, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Tay River Health Centre
9 Eric Devlin Lane
Suite 105
Perth ON K7H 0C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-201-9300
Fax: 613-201-9301

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. WOOHYUN OH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Oh (CPSO#: 115154 )
Business Address: 105-9 Eric Devlin Lane
Perth ON K7H 0C4
613-201-9300

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WOOHYUN OH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WOOHYUN OH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018