THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:57:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 150 Main street E UNIT A-2
Family Medical Centre
Grimsby On L3M 1P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Natalie Ramsay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jul 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Ramsay (CPSO#: 115164 )
Business Address: 3-29 Plains Rd W
Aldershot FHO
Burlington ON L7T 1E8
Business Address: 1280 Main Street West
Room MDCL-3101A
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Address: 4051 Stadelbauer Dr
Beamsville ON L3J 0S4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 150 Main street E UNIT A-2
Family Medical Centre
Grimsby On L3M 1P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Natalie Ramsay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jul 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Ramsay (CPSO#: 115164 )
Business Address: 3-29 Plains Rd W
Aldershot FHO
Burlington ON L7T 1E8
Business Address: 1280 Main Street West
Room MDCL-3101A
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Address: 4051 Stadelbauer Dr
Beamsville ON L3J 0S4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATALIE SUSANNE RAMSAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMSAY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATALIE SUSANNE RAMSAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMSAY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Apr 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018