THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:56:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 320 College St N
South Bruce Grey Health Centre - Durham
Durham ON N0G 1R0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 340 High St
Southampton Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Southampton ON N0H 2L0
Phone: (519) 797-3230
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Durham-Memorial Site Durham
Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital Southampton
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Durham-Memorial Site
LOCATION: Durham

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital
LOCATION: Southampton

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brendan Sanders Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Sanders (CPSO#: 115176 )
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 320 College St N
South Bruce Grey Health Centre - Durham
Durham ON N0G 1R0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 340 High St
Southampton Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Southampton ON N0H 2L0
Phone: (519) 797-3230
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Durham-Memorial Site Durham
Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital Southampton
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Durham-Memorial Site
LOCATION: Durham

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital
LOCATION: Southampton

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brendan Sanders Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Sanders (CPSO#: 115176 )
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRENDAN SCOTT PHILIP SANDERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDERS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRENDAN SCOTT PHILIP SANDERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDERS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Feb 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018