THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:52:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Credit Valley Hospital
Emergency Department
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058132200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ryan D.H. Tam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Apr 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Tam (CPSO#: 115193 )
Business Address: Credit Valley Hospital - Trillium Health Partners
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-4530

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Credit Valley Hospital
Emergency Department
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058132200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ryan D.H. Tam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Apr 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Tam (CPSO#: 115193 )
Business Address: Credit Valley Hospital - Trillium Health Partners
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-4530

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RYAN DING HOU TAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RYAN DING HOU TAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Sep 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2018