THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:27:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 338-4618
Fax: (905) 338-4639

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Nov 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Boivin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Nov 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Boivin (CPSO#: 115234 )
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
905-338-4618

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 338-4618
Fax: (905) 338-4639

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Nov 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Boivin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Nov 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Boivin (CPSO#: 115234 )
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
905-338-4618

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW PAUL BOIVIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOIVIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW PAUL BOIVIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOIVIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 May 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Sep 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 May 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 May 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2018