THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 04:00:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164382911
Extension: 52021
Fax: 4164318279
Address: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough Health Network - Centenary Campus
Cancer Clinic
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Phone: 416-284-8131
Extension: 4666
Fax: 416-281-7228

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 13 Sep 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 13 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Victor Lo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Lo (CPSO#: 115240 )
Business Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
4164382911 Extn: 83060

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: McMaster University, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164382911
Extension: 52021
Fax: 4164318279
Address: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough Health Network - Centenary Campus
Cancer Clinic
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Phone: 416-284-8131
Extension: 4666
Fax: 416-281-7228

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 13 Sep 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 13 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Victor Lo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Lo (CPSO#: 115240 )
Business Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
4164382911 Extn: 83060

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VICTOR LO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VICTOR LO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018