THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:36:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical Academy of Silesia, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 80 Thickson Rd S
Glen Hill Medical
Whitby ON L1N 7T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-674-0455
Fax: 905-674-0480
Address: 8 Green Lane
MCI The Doctor's Office
Thornhill ON L3T 7P7
Phone: 9057640188
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jul 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 09 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.INDRAKUMARAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Indrakumaran (CPSO#: 115245 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: Medical Academy of Silesia, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 80 Thickson Rd S
Glen Hill Medical
Whitby ON L1N 7T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-674-0455
Fax: 905-674-0480
Address: 8 Green Lane
MCI The Doctor's Office
Thornhill ON L3T 7P7
Phone: 9057640188
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jul 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 09 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.INDRAKUMARAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Indrakumaran (CPSO#: 115245 )

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
23 Jan 2020
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 23 2020
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Judy Kalista Indrakumaran may practise medicine independently in family
medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Judy Kalista Indrakumaran may practise medicine independently in family
medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical Academy of Silesia, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 23 Jan 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 29 Nov 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 Jan 2020

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 29 Nov 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 2018