THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:17:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough Centenary Hospital/Geriatric GAIN Clinic
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-281-7446
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. AI XIN LIU MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Liu (CPSO#: 115254 )
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
4162817446

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: McMaster University, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough Centenary Hospital/Geriatric GAIN Clinic
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-281-7446
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. AI XIN LIU MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Liu (CPSO#: 115254 )
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
4162817446

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AI XIN LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AI XIN LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 Dec 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 Jun 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 May 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 Dec 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 May 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018