THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:39:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 150 Emmett Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6M 0C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-614-9494
Fax: 416-245-9563
Address: 120-115 Christopher Dr
Cambridge ON N1R 4S1
Phone: 519-267-7855
Fax: 519-267-7955
Address: 60 Richview Rd
Etobicoke ON M9A 5E4
Phone: +1 (416) 243-7653
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 25 Morton Shulman Ave
Office of the Chief Coroner
North York ON M3M 0B1
Phone: (416) 314-4100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2045 Finch Ave W
North York ON M3N 1M9
Phone: (416) 745-0811
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 777 Simcoe St S
Oshawa ON L1H 4K5
Phone: (905) 721-0003
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1955 Valley Farm Rd
Pickering ON L1V 3R6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 59 Lawson Rd
Scarborough ON M1C 2J1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 228 Queen St E
Toronto ON M5A 1S3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 66 Roncesvalles Ave
Toronto ON M6R 3A7
Phone: (416) 536-7122
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
University Health Network Toronto
West Park Healthcare Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: West Park Healthcare Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher Welsh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Aug 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Welsh (CPSO#: 115264 )
Business Address: 150 Emmett Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6M 2J5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 150 Emmett Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6M 0C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-614-9494
Fax: 416-245-9563
Address: 120-115 Christopher Dr
Cambridge ON N1R 4S1
Phone: 519-267-7855
Fax: 519-267-7955
Address: 60 Richview Rd
Etobicoke ON M9A 5E4
Phone: +1 (416) 243-7653
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 25 Morton Shulman Ave
Office of the Chief Coroner
North York ON M3M 0B1
Phone: (416) 314-4100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2045 Finch Ave W
North York ON M3N 1M9
Phone: (416) 745-0811
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 777 Simcoe St S
Oshawa ON L1H 4K5
Phone: (905) 721-0003
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1955 Valley Farm Rd
Pickering ON L1V 3R6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 59 Lawson Rd
Scarborough ON M1C 2J1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 228 Queen St E
Toronto ON M5A 1S3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 66 Roncesvalles Ave
Toronto ON M6R 3A7
Phone: (416) 536-7122
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
University Health Network Toronto
West Park Healthcare Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: West Park Healthcare Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher Welsh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Aug 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Welsh (CPSO#: 115264 )
Business Address: 150 Emmett Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6M 2J5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER CULLEN WELSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WELSH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER CULLEN WELSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WELSH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018