THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:25:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: South Ottawa Medical Centre
2-1650 Queensdale Ave
Gloucester ON K1T 1N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-244-4400
Fax: 613-244-3399
Address: 566 Louise St
Winchester District Memorial Hospital
Department of Surgery - Surgical Assist
Winchester ON K0C 2K0
Phone: (613) 774-2420
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: South Ottawa Medical Centre
2-1650 Queensdale Ave
Gloucester ON K1T 1N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-244-4400
Fax: 613-244-3399
Address: 566 Louise St
Winchester District Memorial Hospital
Department of Surgery - Surgical Assist
Winchester ON K0C 2K0
Phone: (613) 774-2420
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMEIR MAKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAKAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMEIR MAKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAKAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jan 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018