THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:59:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 105-380 Burnham St
Peterborough ON K9H 1T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Phone: 7057432121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Laura MacMillan-Jones Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. L. MacMillan-Jones (CPSO#: 115313 )
Business Address: 380 Burnham Street
Suite 105
Peterborough Ontario K9H 1T6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 105-380 Burnham St
Peterborough ON K9H 1T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Phone: 7057432121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Laura MacMillan-Jones Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. L. MacMillan-Jones (CPSO#: 115313 )
Business Address: 380 Burnham Street
Suite 105
Peterborough Ontario K9H 1T6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA DAWN MACMILLAN-JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACMILLAN-JONES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA DAWN MACMILLAN-JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACMILLAN-JONES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018