THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 05:10:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 303-4473 Innes Rd
Orléans ON K4A 1A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6138305111
Fax: 6138305112

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jul 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 22 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abadir Bibawy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jun 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bibawy (CPSO#: 115331 ) Dr. R. Abadir (CPSO#: 117545 )
Business Address: 303-4473 Innes Rd
Orléans ON K4A 1A7
6138305111

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 303-4473 Innes Rd
Orléans ON K4A 1A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6138305111
Fax: 6138305112

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jul 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 22 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abadir Bibawy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jun 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bibawy (CPSO#: 115331 ) Dr. R. Abadir (CPSO#: 117545 )
Business Address: 303-4473 Innes Rd
Orléans ON K4A 1A7
6138305111

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIANNE EMIL LOUCA BIBAWY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIBAWY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIANNE EMIL LOUCA BIBAWY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIBAWY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jul 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018