THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:48:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 43 Wellesley St E
Sunnybrook Holland Centre
Department of Family and Community Medicine
Floor 2, Mail Box #16
Toronto ON M4Y 1H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-480-6100
Extension: 2385
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MARKO BRASIC MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Feb 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Brasic (CPSO#: 115406 )
Business Address: 43 Wellesley Street East
Toronto Ontario M4Y 1H1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 43 Wellesley St E
Sunnybrook Holland Centre
Department of Family and Community Medicine
Floor 2, Mail Box #16
Toronto ON M4Y 1H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-480-6100
Extension: 2385
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MARKO BRASIC MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Feb 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Brasic (CPSO#: 115406 )
Business Address: 43 Wellesley Street East
Toronto Ontario M4Y 1H1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARKO BRASIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRASIC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARKO BRASIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRASIC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018