THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:50:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, TURKISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mill Pond Medical Centre
106 Victoria St W
Alliston Ontario L9R 1Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 4350080
Fax: 705-435-0083

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

HOSPITAL: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alliston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F.MAHDI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Mahdi (CPSO#: 115421 )
Business Address: 1-106 Victoria St W
2ND FLOOR
Alliston ON L9R 1Y7
705-435-0080
Business Address: 106 Victoria St W
Alliston ON L9R 1Y7
705-435-0080

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, TURKISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mill Pond Medical Centre
106 Victoria St W
Alliston Ontario L9R 1Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 4350080
Fax: 705-435-0083

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

HOSPITAL: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alliston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F.MAHDI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Mahdi (CPSO#: 115421 )
Business Address: 1-106 Victoria St W
2ND FLOOR
Alliston ON L9R 1Y7
705-435-0080
Business Address: 106 Victoria St W
Alliston ON L9R 1Y7
705-435-0080

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FATIMA HIJRAN R MAHDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHDI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FATIMA HIJRAN R MAHDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHDI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018