THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:41:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Stokes St
Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
Division of Medicine in Psychiatry
Room 2272
Toronto ON M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lydia Schramm Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Nov 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Schramm (CPSO#: 115422 )
Business Address: 2240 Lake Shore Blvd W
Etobicoke ON M8V 0B1
Business Address: 100 Stokes St
Room 2272
Toronto ON M6J 1H4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Stokes St
Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
Division of Medicine in Psychiatry
Room 2272
Toronto ON M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lydia Schramm Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Nov 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Schramm (CPSO#: 115422 )
Business Address: 2240 Lake Shore Blvd W
Etobicoke ON M8V 0B1
Business Address: 100 Stokes St
Room 2272
Toronto ON M6J 1H4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LYDIA EILEEN SCHRAMM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHRAMM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LYDIA EILEEN SCHRAMM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHRAMM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018