THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 11:08:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3400 Hwy 144
City of Lakes, Chelmsford Site
Chelmsford ON P0M 1L0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-855-1018
Fax: 705-855-9007
Address: Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Phone: 705-523-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 935 Ramsey Lake Rd
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
Clinical Faculty
Sudbury ON P3E 2C6
Phone: 705-675-4883
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Veterinary Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Veterinary
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michelle L. Taylor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jul 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Taylor (CPSO#: 115451 )
Business Address: 3400 Hwy 144
Chelmsford ON P0M 1L0
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3400 Hwy 144
City of Lakes, Chelmsford Site
Chelmsford ON P0M 1L0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-855-1018
Fax: 705-855-9007
Address: Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Phone: 705-523-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 935 Ramsey Lake Rd
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
Clinical Faculty
Sudbury ON P3E 2C6
Phone: 705-675-4883
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Veterinary Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Veterinary
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michelle L. Taylor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jul 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Taylor (CPSO#: 115451 )
Business Address: 3400 Hwy 144
Chelmsford ON P0M 1L0
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHELLE LEIGH TAYLOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAYLOR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHELLE LEIGH TAYLOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAYLOR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018