THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 02:02:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Centre
Department of Family Medicine
980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 63 Algoma St N
Thunder Bay ON P7A 4Z6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. ALANA RAWANA BARON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Feb 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rawana Baron (CPSO#: 115458 )
Business Address: 470-63 Algoma St N
Thunder Bay ON P7A 4Z6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Centre
Department of Family Medicine
980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 63 Algoma St N
Thunder Bay ON P7A 4Z6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. ALANA RAWANA BARON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Feb 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rawana Baron (CPSO#: 115458 )
Business Address: 470-63 Algoma St N
Thunder Bay ON P7A 4Z6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALANA JEANETTE MOLLY RAWANA BARON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAWANA BARON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALANA JEANETTE MOLLY RAWANA BARON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAWANA BARON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Dec 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jan 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018