THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:57:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1744 Oriole Dr
Dube Medical Office
Sudbury ON P3E 5L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-522-2263
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 May 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 12 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Emily Dube Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Dube (CPSO#: 115474 )
Business Address: 1744 Oriole Dr
Sudbury ON P3E 5L7
7055222263

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1744 Oriole Dr
Dube Medical Office
Sudbury ON P3E 5L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-522-2263
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 May 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 12 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Emily Dube Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Dube (CPSO#: 115474 )
Business Address: 1744 Oriole Dr
Sudbury ON P3E 5L7
7055222263

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMILY SHANTA DUBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUBE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMILY SHANTA DUBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUBE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 May 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 May 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018