THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:17:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Health Sciences North
Department of Critical Care
3rd floor, Center Tower
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7055237100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 20 Sep 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. JEFKINS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jefkins (CPSO#: 115486 )
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
7055237100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Health Sciences North
Department of Critical Care
3rd floor, Center Tower
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7055237100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 20 Sep 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. JEFKINS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jefkins (CPSO#: 115486 )
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
7055237100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW JORDON JEFKINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEFKINS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW JORDON JEFKINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEFKINS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Oct 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018