THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 03:28:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1235 Wilson Ave
Humber River Hospital
Emergency Medicine
North York ON M3M 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 300-440 Bathurst St
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Family Health Team
Toronto ON M5T 2S6
Phone: 416-603-5888
Fax: (416) 603-5821

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital Red Lake
University Health Network Toronto
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Red Lake

HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Geraldton District Hospital
LOCATION: Geraldton

HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Kepecs Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kepecs (CPSO#: 115503 )
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Ave
North York ON M3M 0B2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1235 Wilson Ave
Humber River Hospital
Emergency Medicine
North York ON M3M 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 300-440 Bathurst St
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Family Health Team
Toronto ON M5T 2S6
Phone: 416-603-5888
Fax: (416) 603-5821

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital Red Lake
University Health Network Toronto
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Red Lake

HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Geraldton District Hospital
LOCATION: Geraldton

HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Kepecs Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kepecs (CPSO#: 115503 )
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Ave
North York ON M3M 0B2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID MATTHEW KEPECS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEPECS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID MATTHEW KEPECS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEPECS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Feb 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018