THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:04:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Charlton Avenue East
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Division of Plastic Surgery
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1Y3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055186246
Fax: 9055283365

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D'Abbondanza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. D'Abbondanza (CPSO#: 115565 )
Business Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1Y3
9055186246

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Charlton Avenue East
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Division of Plastic Surgery
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1Y3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055186246
Fax: 9055283365

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D'Abbondanza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. D'Abbondanza (CPSO#: 115565 )
Business Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1Y3
9055186246

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSEPHINE ASSUNTA D'ABBONDANZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. D'ABBONDANZA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSEPHINE ASSUNTA D'ABBONDANZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. D'ABBONDANZA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018