THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:16:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Lower Jarvis Street
Toronto Ontario M5E 1Z2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6478279200
Fax: 6478279202
Address: 222 Lansdowne Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6K 3C6
Phone: (647) 725-6555
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. NHAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Nov 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Nhan (CPSO#: 115577 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Lower Jarvis Street
Toronto Ontario M5E 1Z2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6478279200
Fax: 6478279202
Address: 222 Lansdowne Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6K 3C6
Phone: (647) 725-6555
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. NHAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Nov 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Nhan (CPSO#: 115577 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DERRICK DUY-KHOA NHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DERRICK DUY-KHOA NHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Apr 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018