THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:39:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Main St W
3rd floor
Hamilton ON L8P 1H6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055285553
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2A-19 Bold St
Hamilton ON L8P 1T3
Phone: 905-540-1900
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 308-27 Roncesvalles Ave
Toronto ON M6R 3B2
Phone: 416-534-6699
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 30 The Queensway
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Phone: 4166251460
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 96 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6R 2K8
Phone: 4168556210
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Saikaley and Ovens Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Saikaley (CPSO#: 115957 ) Dr. L. Ovens (CPSO#: 115600 )
Business Address: 15 Wellesley St W
Unit 301
Toronto ON M4Y 0G7
(416) 413-7999
Business Address: 27 Roncesvalles Ave
Unit 308
Toronto ON M6R 3B2
Business Address: 30 The Queensway
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Business Address: 2A-19 Bold St
Hamilton ON L8P 1T3
905-540-1900
Business Address: 100 Main St W
#3
Hamilton ON L8P 1H6
905-528-5553
Business Address: 50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155
Business Address: 100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100
Business Address: 118-5045 Mainway
Burlington ON L7L 5H9
(905) 315-7007

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Main St W
3rd floor
Hamilton ON L8P 1H6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055285553
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2A-19 Bold St
Hamilton ON L8P 1T3
Phone: 905-540-1900
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 308-27 Roncesvalles Ave
Toronto ON M6R 3B2
Phone: 416-534-6699
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 30 The Queensway
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Phone: 4166251460
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 96 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6R 2K8
Phone: 4168556210
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Saikaley and Ovens Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Saikaley (CPSO#: 115957 ) Dr. L. Ovens (CPSO#: 115600 )
Business Address: 15 Wellesley St W
Unit 301
Toronto ON M4Y 0G7
(416) 413-7999
Business Address: 27 Roncesvalles Ave
Unit 308
Toronto ON M6R 3B2
Business Address: 30 The Queensway
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Business Address: 2A-19 Bold St
Hamilton ON L8P 1T3
905-540-1900
Business Address: 100 Main St W
#3
Hamilton ON L8P 1H6
905-528-5553
Business Address: 50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155
Business Address: 100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100
Business Address: 118-5045 Mainway
Burlington ON L7L 5H9
(905) 315-7007

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA SIMONE OVENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OVENS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA SIMONE OVENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OVENS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018